Marshall v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Marshall and Beverly J. Marshall
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Decker Ford, Inc. a California corporation Doing business as Future Ford of Clovis
Case Number: 1:2017cv00006
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Michael J Seng
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ONLY) On August 9, 2017, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal (Doc. #24 ) under Rule 41. In light of Plaintiffs voluntary dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Rule 41(a)(2)(A)(ii). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/9/2017. (Lafata, M)
August 8, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Beverly J. Marshall. (Le Pere, Jeffrey)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER : Discovery Non-Expert due by 11/30/2017, Expert due 2/28/2018. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/15/2017, Rebuttal due 1/16/2018. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 2/28/2018. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/31/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 6/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/21/2017. (Lafata, M)
April 20, 2017 Filing 22 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/20/2017, in chambers and off the record. Scheduling Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Jeffrey Le Pere telephonically present. Defendants Counsel Amy Maclear, Tin Brian Nguyen telephonically present. (Lafata, M)
April 17, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tin Brian Trong Nguyen on behalf of Decker Ford, Inc.. Attorney Nguyen, Tin Brian Trong added. (Nguyen, Tin Brian)
April 13, 2017 Filing 20 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Beverly J. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Le Pere, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: Motion to Strike, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has deemed Plaintiffs #12 Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Dananges noticed for hearing on 4/3/2017 before Senior District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). And, as such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the matter will be taken under submission as of that date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/30/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 29, 2017 Filing 17 ANSWER by Decker Ford, Inc..(Prudian, Gary)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: **TEXT ENTRY ONLY** In order to allot for enough time for Parties to meet and confer for a Joint Status Report after Defendants Reponse is due, 3/29/2017, See Stipulation #15 ; the Court CONTINUES the INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE to 4/20/2017 at 10:30 AM in Yosemite (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Parties may appear in person or by phone. Telephonic conferences are joined by calling: (888)204-5984 and entering code 4446176. Please email the Courtroom deputy to indicate if you will be appearing by telephone @ mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov. A Joint Scheduling Report shall be electronically filed in CM/ECF one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference and be e-mailed, in Word format, to mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/27/2017. (Lafata, M)
March 9, 2017 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #14 Summons Returned Executed to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not more than 28 Days by Decker Ford, Inc.. Attorney Prudian, Gary Haroutoin added. (Prudian, Gary)
March 8, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Decker Ford, Inc. served on 2/8/2017, answer due 3/1/2017. (Le Pere, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ford Motor Company served on 1/11/2017, answer due 2/1/2017. (Le Pere, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to STRIKE Plaintiff's Prayer for Punitive Damages by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Maclear, Amy)
February 1, 2017 Filing 11 STIPULATION AMENDED STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Ford Motor Company. (Maclear, Amy)
February 1, 2017 Filing 10 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Maclear, Amy added. (Maclear, Amy)
January 5, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hallen D. Rosner on behalf of Beverly J. Marshall. (Rosner, Hallen)
January 3, 2017 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
January 3, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Decker Ford, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kendra Jayne Woods* *Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP* *10085 Carrol Canyon Rd., Suite 100* *San Diego, CA 92131*. (Jessen, A)
January 3, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ford Motor Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kendra Jayne Woods* *Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP* *10085 Carrol Canyon Rd., Suite 100* *San Diego, CA 92131*. (Jessen, A)
January 3, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Beverly J Marshall. (Woods, Kendra)
January 3, 2017 Filing 4 STATEMENT of Damages by Plaintiff Beverly J Marshall. (Woods, Kendra)
January 3, 2017 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Venue by Beverly J Marshall. (Woods, Kendra)
January 3, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Decker Ford, Inc., Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation by Beverly J Marshall. Attorney Woods, Kendra Jayne added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Woods, Kendra)
January 3, 2017 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Beverly J Marshall (Woods, Kendra)
January 3, 2017 CAED RECEIPT number 0972-6844078 for $400.00 for Civil Filing Fee by Kendra Jayne Woods. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly J. Marshall
Represented By: Hallen D. Rosner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Le Pere
Represented By: Kendra Jayne Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Amy Maclear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decker Ford, Inc. a California corporation Doing business as Future Ford of Clovis
Represented By: Gary Haroutoin Prudian
Represented By: Tin Brian Trong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?