Johnston Farms v. Fresh Growers Direct, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johnston Farms
Defendant: Fresh Growers Direct, Inc., Yuval Yusufov and Gill Goldman
Case Number: 1:2017cv00016
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT AGAINST DEFENDANT YUVAL YUSUFOV BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART (Doc. 17) referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due 21 days. Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/24/2017. (Thorp, J)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Supplement Record. Plaintiff shall file the following by no later than Tuesday, December 12, 2017, evidence showing that, during the relevant time period: (1) Fresh Growers Direct, Inc. had insufficient assets to s atisfy the liability; (2) Fresh Growers Direct, Inc. was a closely-held corporation, Defendant Yusufov had an active management role in Fresh Growers Direct, Inc., and/or that Defendant Yusufov acted for Fresh Growers Direct, Inc.; and (3) Defendant Yusufov breached his fiduciary duty to maintain PACA trust assets. To permit Plaintiff adequate time to submit its supplemental evidence, the hearing on the Motion currently set for November 29, 2017, is hereby CONTINUED to December 20, 2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/21/2017. (Timken, A)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Terminate Defendants Fresh Growers Direct, Inc. and Gill Goldman signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/30/2017. (Flores, E)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE RECOMMENDED FOR DISMISSAL. No later than July 18, 2017, Plaintiff shall file a statement showing cause why the Court should not recommend to the presiding district court judge that this action be dismis sed for failure to comply with the Court's May 31, 2017 order and for want of prosecution. The Court further CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if it fails to file this statement by July 18, 2017, the Court will recommend to the presiding district court j udge that this action be dismissed, in its entirety. The Scheduling Conference currently set for July 25, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED, to be reset, if necessary, upon receipt of Plaintiff's response to this order to show cause. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/11/2016. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston Farms v. Fresh Growers Direct, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnston Farms
Represented By: Bartholomew Mark Botta
Represented By: Jing Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Growers Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuval Yusufov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?