Ramirez v. Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Petitioner: Erik Daniel Ramirez
Respondent: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00029
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED with Prejudice re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Erik Daniel Ramirez ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 0831/17. Objections to F&R due by 9/25/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/24/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying 2 Motion for Issuance of Certificate of Appealability as Premature, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Amend to Name a proper Respondent and substituting S. Frauenheim as Respondent signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Petitioner Leave to File Motion to Amend to Name a Proper Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/19/17. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erik Daniel Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?