Hearns v. Gonzales, et al.

Plaintiff: Jamar R. Hearns
Defendant: Rosa Gonzales, Fondren, R. Mata and R. Fisher
Case Number: 1:2017cv00038
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline for Limited Purpose 30 ; NEW DEADLINE for Plaintiff to File Motions to Compel: March 4, 2019; NEW DEADLINE for All Parties to File Dispositive Motions: May 4, 2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/18/2019. (Hellings, J)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Extending Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline From February 14, 2019 to March 14, 2019 for All Parties 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/30/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING 20 Findings and Recommendations In Part; ORDER for This Case to Proceed Against Defendant C/O Rosa Gonzales on Plaintiff's Claims for Retaliation, Violation of the Free Exercise Clause, and Bane Act Claim, and Dismissing All Remaining Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/13/18. (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Case Proceed Against Defendant C/O Rosa Gonzalez on Plaintiff's Claims for Retaliation, Violation of the Free Exercise Clause, and Related State Law Claims, and that All other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/22/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/12/2018.(Flores, E)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying 16 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/12/2018. (Flores, E)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING Order Issued on February 6, 2017 8 ; ORDER GRANTING Amended Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/31/17. (Hellings, J)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING Application to Proceed IFP 2 ; ORDER for Plaintiff to Pay $350.00 Filing Fee in Full Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/6/17. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearns v. Gonzales, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar R. Hearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fondren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?