Watkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Danny Ray Watkins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00042
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER for the Award and Payment of Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA in the amount of $3,400.00, as authorized by 28 U.S.C. §2412(d), are awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/14/2018. (Rooney, M)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION for Voluntary remand pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g) and entry of Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time, document 15 , with defendant/respondent to file her responsive brief by 12/6/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/6/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Ray Watkins
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Beatrice Na
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?