Cramblit v California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, et al
Plaintiff: James Cramblit
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, R Chavez, S. Torres, C. Guerrero, N Gonzalez, K. Toor, R. Fisher, Jr. and K.J. Allen
Case Number: 1:2017cv00058
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that Inmate James Cramblit is no Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff James Cramblit CDCR# F-08646 for Settlement Conference on March 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/23/2018. (Flores, E)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/11/2018. Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 09:00 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng.(Flores, E)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/05/2018. (Flores, E)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Defendants re 16 , 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. This case is assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The New Case No. is: 1:17-cv-0058-DAD-SAB. (Gonzalez, R)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/21/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 23 Reply to Defendants' Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/2/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STRIKING Unsigned Complaint 5 and Requiring Plaintiff to File Signed Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2017: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF CA. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/11/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017) [Transferred from cand on 1/12/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cramblit v California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cramblit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Toor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?