Jaramillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gerardo Jaramillo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00064
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/01/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Petitioner's motion for an award of attorney fees pursuant t o Section 406(b) in the amount of $25,514.75 is GRANTED. The Court authorized payment to Petitioner Melissa Newel in the amount of $25,514.75 representing attorney fees being withheld from Plaintiff's past due disability benefits. Upon receipt of this sum, Petitioner shall remit $4,800.00 directly to Plaintiff as an offset for EAJA fees previously awarded pursuant to 298 U.S.C. § 2412. (Gonzales, V)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEE AND REQUIRING COUNSEL TO SERVE COPY ON PLAINTIFF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff may file objections to the findings and recommendations within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this order; The Commissioners response, if any, shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this order; and Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff and file proof of service of the order within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/10/2020. (Hernandez, M)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order re stipulation for award of attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/2018. (Rosales, O)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal and Remanding for Further Development of the Record signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/14/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR A SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before December 29, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before January 16, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaramillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Jaramillo
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?