Lear v. Manasrah
Plaintiff: Roderick William Lear
Defendant: A. Manasrah
Case Number: 1:2017cv00071
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 55 , 62 , 59 , 70 , 85 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/26/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 55 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED, 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED, 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions be DENIED and 59 & 70 Plaintiff&# 039;s Motions for Temporary Restraining Order be DENIED re 25 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/31/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER on Request for Clarification 82 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/21/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to correct Complaint; denying Defendant's Motion to strike Evidence; and granting Plaintiff's Motion regarding Exhibits 54 , 77 , 80 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/16/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING 73 Motion for Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/16/2019. Plaintiff is permitted to file an opposition over fifty (50) pages in length. (Jessen, A)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 50 ; denying Plaintiff's Motion to prevent Defendants from circumventing Discovery Rules 51 ; granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 57 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/16/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 42 Plaintiff's Motion, Construed as a Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/18/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny 42 Motion for Court Order; Clerk to Send Copy of this Order to Litigation Coordinator signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/11/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DIRECTING United States Marshals Service to Re-Attempt Service on Defendant CSP-COR signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS finding certain claims cognizable and dismissing other claims and Defendants and referring back to assigned Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/2/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION for Service of Cognizable Claims and to Dismiss all other Claims and Defendants with Prejudice; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/19/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 10/6/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Deeming ECF No. 27 WITHDRAWN; Clerk to TERMINATE ECF Nos. 27, 28 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER adopting 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 18 Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief be DENIED re 18 MOTION requesting an Order from the Court for Prison to timely process request for Library Access; Honor and Process all Court Order; Ord er Prison not to with hold any mail from the Court ; referred to Judge Drozd; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to send a copy of this Order to Litigation Coordinator at Plaintiff's Institution and Court request the assistance of the Litigat ion Coordinator in facilitating the Plaintiff's access to the law library, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/22/17. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Copy of this order sent to Litigation Coordinator at HIGH DESERT STATE PRISON) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 7 Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER DENYING 8 Motion ;ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 12 REQUEST that Court Transfer His Request for Restraining Order to Sacramento Division, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/02/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER discharging 14 Order to Show Cause and granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, FAILURE TO OBEY A COURT ORDER, AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE RE 10 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/4/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Clerk to assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to deny REQUEST for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 7 , 8 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/28/2017. Case assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The new case number is 1:17-cv-00071-DAD-MJS-(PC). Rreferred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (1) Severing Claims and (2) Transferring Severed Portion to the Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/15/17. (Sacramento Case No. 2:17-cv-00326 EFB (PC).(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lear v. Manasrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick William Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Manasrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?