Tarkington v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Denice L. Tarkington
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00072
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/25/2018. (Hall, S)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE on 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2018. Opposition/notice of non-opposition due by 7/13/2018; Reply due by 7/20/2018. (Hall, S)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REMANDING the Action Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g); ORDER DIRECTING Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Denice L. Tarkington and Against Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/26/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISCHARGING 15 the Order to Show Cause Dated September 8, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/2017. (Hall, S)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/8/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/7/2017. Confidential letter brief due by 7/19/2017. (Hall, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP 2 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents and Scheduling Order; ORDER DIRECTING Service of the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/17. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarkington v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denice L. Tarkington
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?