Risher v. Libby, et al.
Plaintiff: Richard Risher
Defendant: Dr. Ebinosa, Dr. Rasheed, Dr. Jacques, Dr. Contreras, Dr. Trevino, Ms. Ponse Deleon and DOE 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2017cv00087
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 25 within Thirty Days,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/19/2017. (Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 25 within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/5/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/31/2017. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel 7 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/25/17: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (1) Granting Motion To Proceed IFP (Dkt # 2 ); (2) Dismissing Defendant; And (3) Transferring Civil Action To The Eastern District of California: The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from Plaintiff's trust account th e $350 owed in monthly payments in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in Plaintiff's account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). The Court dismi sses the claims against Defendant Libby from this action. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/18/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR. Per Order, a copy also was mailed to Secretary of CDCR at address on the Order.) (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 1/19/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risher v. Libby, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Risher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ebinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Rasheed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Ponse Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?