Hejduk v. Spin Master Corp, et al.
Plaintiff: Jodie Hejduk
Defendant: Spin Master Corp and Spin Master Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2017cv00093
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendants deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be extended to April 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO APRIL 4, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendants deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be extended to March 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (ECF No. 9 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/10/2017: It is hereby ordered that Defendants Spin Master Corp. and Spin Master Inc.'s response to the complaint shall be filed on or before March 13, 2017. (Valdez, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hejduk v. Spin Master Corp, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Hejduk
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin Master Corp
Represented By: Ryan David Evans
Represented By: Scott Joseph Fishwick
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin Master Inc.,
Represented By: Ryan David Evans
Represented By: Scott Joseph Fishwick
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?