Jacobsen v. Maldinado
Plaintiff: Michael Jacobsen
Defendant: Maldinado
Case Number: 1:2017cv00101
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING 58 Motion to Reopen Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/19. (Marrujo, C)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 44 Motion to stay proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER STRIKING 46 Plaintiff's Lodged First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/16/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER overruling Objections to Findings and Recommendations 35 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/7/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Adopting 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DISMISSING Doe Defendants, without Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Re-Serve Orders 24 & 27 on Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to randomly assign District Judge to action. FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss Doe Defendants from action without prejudice 22 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/30/2017. Action assigned to and referred to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. New case number is 1:17-cv-00101-AWI-BAM-(PC). Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER,Discharging Order to Show Cause Why Doe Defendants Should Not Be Dismissed 15 ; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Substitute Doe Defendants or File Status Report Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/17. (Hellings, J)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed and Request for Copy of Complaint; ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Maldinado Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; and ORDER Ex tending Show Cause Order and Directing Plaintiff to Provide Written Notice Identifying Doe Defendants for Service of Process, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/29/2017. Clerk directed to mail one copy of the original complaint to Plaintiff. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Provide Written Notice Identifying Doe Defendants for Service of Process or SHOW CAUSE Why Doe Defendants should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit service documents or show cause why Defendant, Maldinado should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute re 8 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/11/2017. Show Cause Response / Case Management Deadline set for 9/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing the Clerk's Office to Re-Serve 10 Order on Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 Request for Status of Case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/13/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobsen v. Maldinado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maldinado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?