Avila, Jr. v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Heriberto Avila, Jr.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Fay Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00146
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the District Court Dismiss this Case. Matter referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/12/2017. (Timken, A)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Recommended For Dismissal. Plaintiff shall show cause within twenty-one (21) days of the date of service of this Order why this action should not be dismissed for his failure to comply with the Court� 39;s April 12, 2017 order by not filing an amended complaint within the specified period of time. The Court further CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he fails to file this statement within twenty-one (21) days of the date of service of this Order, the Court will recommend to the presiding district court judge that this action be dismissed, in its entirety. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2017. (Timken, A)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/11/2017. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila, Jr. v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Avila, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?