Free v. Peikar et al

Plaintiff: Paul Free
Defendant: Nader Peikar, Lourdes Mettri, Lisa Fuentes-Arce and Tyson
Case Number: 1:2017cv00159
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny without prejudice Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/11/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to grant 19 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER denying 72 Motion to enforce subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/28/2018. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum (Doc. 67 ) is DISCHARGED, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/28/2018. (Hall, S)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING Request for Subpoena Duces Tecum 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Paul Free #42235-198 on June 28, 2018 at 8:30 AM, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 62 Request for Inmate Witnesses; ORDER Requiring Production of Certain Documents at the Evidentiary Hearing; and ORDER Requiring the Defendant to File a Report signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/15/2018. Filing Deadline: 6/21/2018. (Jessen, A)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Cancel Evidentiary Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/11/2018. (Jessen, A)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny without Prejudice Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; Fourteen Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2018. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING 57 Request to Continue the Evidentiary Hearing Without Prejudice; ORDER GRANTING 55 Request to Withdraw 36 Motion to File Under Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Paul Free, BOP Register# 42235-198 for Evidentiary Hearing on June 25, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/22/2018. (Flores, E)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER WITHDRAWING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 45 ; ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing; ORDER DENYING Motion for Sanctions 50 ; ORDER DENYING Motion for Clarification 47 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/9/2018: The Court sets an evidentiary hearing on June 25, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, located at 510 19th Street, Bakersfield, CA 93301. (Hellings, J)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/11/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 4/30/2018.(Flores, E)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims 32 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/30/2018. (Hellings, J)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Mettri Should Not be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/25/18. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/20/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER VACATING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 21 ; REVISED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/15/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Reinstating Dismissed Claims; Directing Clerk of Court to Assign a District Judge to this Case; and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 01/09/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 1/29/2018. (Flores, E)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Serve Defendants Dr. Nader Paikar, Lourdes Mettri, Lisa Fuentes-Arce, and Tyson signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Free v. Peikar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Free
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nader Peikar
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Mettri
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Fuentes-Arce
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?