HH-Fresno LLC v. City of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: HH-Fresno LLC
Defendant: City of Fresno and Development and Resource Management Department
Case Number: 1:2017cv00163
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, with Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/19/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; VACATING DATES; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS; AND DIRECTING THAT STAY SHALL REMAIN IN PLACE. Based upon the settlement of this action, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: All pending matters and dates in this ac tion are VACATED; The parties shall file dispositional documents within forty-five (45) days from the date of service of this order; The undersigned shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement reached by the parties should an issue arise before dismissal; and The stay issued by Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on March 7, 2017 (ECF No. 15) is to remain in effect for an additional 21 days from todays date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HH-Fresno LLC v. City of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HH-Fresno LLC
Represented By: Paul John Cambria, Jr.
Represented By: Erin E. McCampbell, PHV
Represented By: Emily H. O'Reilly, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fresno
Represented By: Joseph D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Development and Resource Management Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?