Raymond Muro et al v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Raymond Muro and Lupe Muro
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00170
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/1/2018: The Clerk shall close the case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/8/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/30/2018, Rebuttal 4/13/2018; Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/9/2018, Expert 4/23/2018; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 5/7/2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/21/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond Muro et al v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Muro
Represented By: John Edward Kerley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupe Muro
Represented By: John Edward Kerley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Marjie D. Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?