Hyphy Music, Inc. v. Hernandez, et al.
Plaintiff: Hyphy Music, Inc.
Defendant: Jose David Hernandez, Kevin Berger, Javier Morales, Joel Medina, Colonize Media, Inc., M-Gen Stream, Inc., DH1 Talent Development, Inc., DH1 Media, Inc., Luna Music Corporation and Abel De Luna
Case Number: 1:2017cv00182
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/1/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation and Moving Hearing Date, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/9/2018. ( 32 Motion to Strike and 33 Motion to Dismiss previously set for hearing on 1/23/2018, are CONTINUED to 3/6/2018, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING an Extension of Time in Excess of 28 Days to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendant ABEL DE LUNA's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is extended to December 4, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/21/2017. (Timken, A)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference; ORDER,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/4/2017. ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2017 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to TERMINATE Defendants Kevin Berger, Javier Morales, and Joel Medina signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyphy Music, Inc. v. Hernandez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyphy Music, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina Diane Garabedian
Represented By: Douglas Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonize Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-Gen Stream, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH1 Talent Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH1 Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna Music Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abel De Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?