Paez, Jr. v. Community Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Guillermo G. Paez, Jr.
Defendant: Community Regional Medical Center, Orthopedics Surgical Team, Supreet Manesh, Manternach, Maximino Brambila and F. Macias
Case Number: 1:2017cv00215
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Prosecute signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/14/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING In Part 12 Findings and Recommendations and Dismissing Action for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/24/17. Third Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim Under Section 1983 re 11 Second Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff's 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/29/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/23/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paez, Jr. v. Community Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo G. Paez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthopedics Surgical Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreet Manesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manternach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximino Brambila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?