Trujillo v. Sabbi Kahlon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Defendant: Sabbi Kahlon Corporation, Mary's Vineyard, Inc. and Save Mart Supermarkets
Case Number: 1:2017cv00231
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to close case and adjust docket to reflect voluntary dismissal 24 and vacating all pending dates and matters signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER assigning case regarding presiding judge signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/15/2017. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. New Case Number: 1:17-cv-00231-SAB. (Lundstrom, T)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 6/29/2017 to 8/14/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/22/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 5/9/2017 to 6/29/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The deadline for the parties to file their Joint Scheduling Report and provide to the other party their initial disclosures is continued to 6/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/2/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER terminating Defendant, Save Mart Supermarkets, dba Save Mart #67 only re 12 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/25/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER vacating April 18, 2017 10 Order closing action and terminating Defendant, Sabbi Kahlon Corporation signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Sabbi Kahlon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Represented By: Zachary Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabbi Kahlon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary's Vineyard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?