Trujillo v. CEC Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Defendant: CEC Entertainment, Inc. and DPI Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00243
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS ON OR BEFORE 8/21/2017. All pending matters and dates are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/21/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND FOR FURTHER CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within whic h Defendant, DPI Group, LLC, must file its responsive pleading is extended to and including June 26, 2017. The Mandatory Scheduling Conference currently set for June 13, 2017 is continued to July 27, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 9, before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties are to file their Joint Scheduling Report no later than seven days prior to the conference. (Thorp, J)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant CEC Entertainment, Inc., as Party in this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/16/2017. (Flores, E)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 5/9/2017 to 6/13/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties are to file their Joint Scheduling Report no later then seven days prior to the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/2/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/17. Filing Deadline: 5/15/2017. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. CEC Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Represented By: Zachary Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEC Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPI Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?