H.W.J. Designs for Agribusiness, Inc. et al v. Rethceif Enterprises, LLC et al

Plaintiff: H.W.J. Designs for Agribusiness, Inc. and Samuel Strapping Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Rethceif Enterprises, LLC and L.P. Brown Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00272
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION EXPERT DECLARATION 124 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/09/2019. The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are given leave to file the declaration attached as Exhibit A to the above-referenced motion. (Gonzales, V)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING L.P. BROWN COMPANY, INC.'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL PAGES IN CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/11/2019. (Kusamura, W)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/11/2019. (Kusamura, W)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Stipulation regarding exchange of proposed patent claims for construction; Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/19/2018. (Rosales, Otilia)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re MOTION ON THE PLEADINGS 65 . Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/26/2018. (Timken, A)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and ORDER to WITHDRAW 34 Motion to Dismiss and Strike signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/28/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re: 31 Motion to Amend Answer and 49 Motion to Strike, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Local Rule 143 Stipulated Name Change of Samuel, Son & Co., Inc. and ORDER re 75 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/7/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ***DISREGARD***STIPULATION and ORDER TO STAY ENFORCEMENT AND EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT UNTIL RESOLUTION OF POST-TRIAL MOTIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/15/2017. (Kusamura, W) Modified on 12/15/2017 (Kusamura, W).
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATED ESI PROTOCOL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/9/2017. (Thorp, J)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/2017. (Timken, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.W.J. Designs for Agribusiness, Inc. et al v. Rethceif Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.W.J. Designs for Agribusiness, Inc.
Represented By: Victor S. De Gyarfas
Represented By: Michael Robert Houston, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Strapping Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Victor S. De Gyarfas
Represented By: Michael Robert Houston, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rethceif Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Max Kleinman-Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.P. Brown Company, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Max Kleinman-Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?