Bracken v. Duran, et al.,
Plaintiff: Justin Bracken
Defendant: Duran, Hernandez and Lima
Case Number: 1:2017cv00306
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CLOSING the Case Based Upon Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/9/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Statement Regarding Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/19/16. 14-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/3/2017 TRANSFERRING this action, 2:17-cv-00189 KJM AC (PC), to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California sitting in Fresno; ORDERING that all future filings reference the new Fresno case number, 1:17-cv-00306 JLT (PC). (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bracken v. Duran, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?