Ruiz v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rachel K. Ruiz
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Hyundai Capital America, Valley First Credit Union, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00323
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close Action 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/17: The Clerk of the Court is HEREBY ORDERED to CLOSE the file in this case and adjust the docket to reflect voluntary dismissal of this action pursuant to Rule 41(a). (Hellings, J)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT REPORT EXPLAINING WHY THE COURT SHOULD RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER SETTLEMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report on or before November 13, 2017, explaining why the Court should retain jurisdiction over the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/8/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents by 11/8/2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to TERMINATE Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as a Party in This Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) 56 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/21/17. (Hellings, J)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC as a Party in this Action Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 41(a), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/29/17. Equifax Information Services LLC terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant Trans Union, LLC as a Party in this Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/17. Trans Union LLC terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendant Hyundai Capital America as a Party in This Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/24/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re 48 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Trans Union LLC, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendant Valley First Credit Union as a Party in This Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/17. Valley First Credit Union terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS on or before July 22, 2017. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss is terminated and the hearing set for June 14, 2017 is vacated. All pending dates and matters in this action are vacated as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank ONLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/23/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS ON OR BEFORE JULY 11, 2017. All pending dates in this action are vacated as to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/15/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Re Stipulation to Continue Motion to Dismiss Hearing 39 ,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/04/2017. (Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS on or before July 1, 2017. All pending dates in this action are vacated as to Defendant Hyundai Capital America only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/2/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING as to 14 MOTION to DISMISS HEARING from 5/17/2017 to 5/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT HYUNDAI CAPITAL AMERICA TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/19/2017. It is hereby ordered that Defendant Hyundai Capital America shall file a response to the complaint on or before May 3, 2017. (Valdez, E)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/18/17. Deadline: 6/17/2017. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel K. Ruiz
Represented By: Stephan A Hoover
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley First Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Eileen T Booth
Represented By: Scott E. Brady, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?