Moses Flores v. Wespak
Plaintiff: Moses Flores
Defendant: Wespak and J.V. Farm Labor Services
Case Number: 1:2017cv00326
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Regarding Dismissal of Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute re 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/29/18. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCREENING ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to file amended complaint 3 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/25/2018. (First Amended Complaint due by 8/28/2018). (Lundstrom, T)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that This Action be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With a Court Order re 3 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/21/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Refile Documents and to Close Case no. 1:17-cv-400 DAD-EPG, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/22/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses Flores v. Wespak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wespak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.V. Farm Labor Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?