Salas v. Facultatieve Technologies The Americas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Salas
Defendant: Facultatieve Technologies The Americas, Inc. and Incinerator Specialists, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00335
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF WAGE LOSS CLAIMS AND INCINERATOR SPECIALISTS, INC. signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 4, 2019. (Munoz, I)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re Stipulation to Continue Certain Discovery Cutoff Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/9/19. (Marrujo, C)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER on Stipulation re Physical Examination of Plaintiff Jonathan Salas, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/19. (Marrujo, C)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Certain Discovery Cutoff Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/14/19. (Gonzalez, R)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 47 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/9/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery (Doc. 39). (1.) Plaintiffs motion to compel supplemental responses to jurisdictional discovery is DENIED. (2.) Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve his r emaining jurisdictional discovery requests on Defendants within seven (7) days of the date of this order; (3.) On or before June 22, 2018, the parties shall each file a status report briefly discussing the status of the case and proposing a joint briefing schedule for Defendant Facultatieve Technologies Limiteds motion to dismiss. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/30/2018. (Herman, H)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER RE 15 Motion of Facultatieve Technologies Limited, Facultatieve Technologies UK Limited and Facultatieve Technologies Supplies Limited to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/25/2017. (Flores, E)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/7/2017. (Herman, H)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Approving Stipulation (Doc. 4) to File Amended Complaint. (1.) The stipulation to allow the filing of the First Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2.) No later than May 25, 2017, Plaintiff Jonathan Salas may file the First Amended Complaint tha t was attached as Exhibit A to the Stipulation to Amend Plaintiffs Complaint; (3.) The previous responsive pleading filed in response to the original complaint shall be DEEMED responsive to the First Amended Complaint. (4.) Plaintiff shall report the status of service on the newly named parties at the scheduling conference, on June 7, 2017. If the newly named parties have not yet appeared by June 7, 2017, the conference will be conducted as a status conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/18/2017. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salas v. Facultatieve Technologies The Americas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Salas
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: Phillip Richard Atillio Mastagni
Represented By: Grant A. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facultatieve Technologies The Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Raymond Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incinerator Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Raymond Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?