Cuevas, et al v. Dias & Fragoso, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosalie Cuevas, Adolfo Gomez-Moreno, Reynaldo Tolano and Agustin Ambriz
Defendant: Dias & Fragoso, INC., D&F Agricultural Enterprises, Inc., Gabriel M. Dias and John L. Fragoso
Case Number: 1:2017cv00357
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 52 Motion for Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement, Award of Service Payments, and Award of Attorney Fees and Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/18/2019. (Flores, E)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to Vacate Dates and Set Schedule for Conditional Judicial Approval of Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/21/2019. It is hereby ordered that: (1) The parties shall file a Motion for Conditional Judicial Approval of Settlement on or before May 6, 2019. (2) The hearing on the parties Motion for Conditional Judicial Approval of Settlement shall be heard on June 7, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (3) Except for the deadlines set forth in this Order all other deadlines in this case are hereby vacated, including specifically, all deadlines related to any motion for conditional certification. (Valdez, E)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Deadlines for Motion for Class Certification, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/11/2018. Class Certification Motion due by 3/22/2019. Class Certification Opposition due by 4/26/2019. Class Certification Reply due by 5/20/2019. MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION set for 7/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Valdez, E)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to Continue Deadlines for Motion for Class Certification, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2018: Motion filed by 1/25/2019, Opposition due by 3/22/2019, Reply due by 4/19/2019, Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hellings, J)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Deadlines for Motion for Class Certification signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/22/2018. It is hereby ordered that the deadlines for briefing the motion for class certification previously set by the court on May 10, 2018 are continued as follows: Motion due by 11/21/2018. Opposition due by 1/18/2019. Reply due by 2/25/2019. Class Certification Hearing set for 3/22/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Valdez, E)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER to File First Amended Complaint: that Plaintiffs shall file a First Amended Complaint, attached to the parties stipulation (Doc. 31), by July 31, 2018 and that Defendants DIAS & FRAGOSO, INC., D & F AGRICULTURAL ENTERPRISES, INC., GABRIEL M. DIAS, and JOHN L. FRAGOSO, shall have thirty days thereafter to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint filed in this matter. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/2018. (Herman, H)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 26 Findings and Recommendations GRANTING Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Conditional FLSA Collective Action Certification and Issuance of Notice, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/2/18. (Marrujo, C)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Plaintiffs' Motion for Collective Certification and Issue Notice (Doc. 21). Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days after being served with the Findings and Recommendation, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/9/2018. (Herman, H)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION Protective ORDER re: Confidential Information, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2017. (Herman, H)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Stipulation (Doc. 8).... parties are to refer to the document for further detailed information. (4.) Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 6/13/2017 to November 28,2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/2017. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuevas, et al v. Dias & Fragoso, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dias & Fragoso, INC.
Represented By: William M. Woolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&F Agricultural Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Woolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel M. Dias
Represented By: William M. Woolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Fragoso
Represented By: William M. Woolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Cuevas
Represented By: John E. Hill
Represented By: Enrique Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolfo Gomez-Moreno
Represented By: Enrique Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Tolano
Represented By: Enrique Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Ambriz
Represented By: John E. Hill
Represented By: Enrique Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?