Wilson v. Torres
Plaintiff: Terrance Wilson
Defendant: Torres
Case Number: 1:2017cv00375
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/27/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for a Protective Order staying merits-based Discovery and granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Reply to Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/04/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?