Griffin v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Johnny Griffin
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00384
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER CLOSING the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/5/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The parties report they had come to terms of settlement. (Doc. 81) They indicate they will seek dismissal of the action soon. Id. at 2. Thus, the Court ORDERS: 1. The stipulation to dismiss the action SHALL be filed no later than March 8, 2019; 2. All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. The parties are advised that failure to comply with this order may result in the Court imposing sanctions, including the dismissal of the action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/11/2019. (Timken, A)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re COURTROOM/TRIAL DECORUM, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/1/2019. (Hall, S)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER on Motion to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Dr. Price, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/2019. (Hall, S)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER 53 Continuing the Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2019. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 2/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Trial submissions due by 1/25/2019. Exhibit binders due by 2/8/2019. Defendant's expert witness will be permitted to testify via teleconference or videoconference, if necessary. (Hall, S)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2018. (Hall, S)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/16/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/11/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 12/1/2017; Expert 4/13/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conferenc e set for 10/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/27/2018; Hearing by 5/25/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/15/2018; Hearing by 7/31/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 11/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Griffin
Represented By: Curtis Eugene Floyd
Represented By: Philip W. Ganong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?