Trujillo v. Khounpaseuth et al
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Defendant: Chansury Khounpaseuth, Arich Ath Syprasert and Boualiene Sypraert
Case Number: 1:2017cv00388
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/17/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS (ECF No. 20 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/10/2017. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's request for an extension of time is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall file dispositional documents on or before October 17, 2017. (Valdez, E)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Requiring the Parties to File Dispositional Documents (Deadline: 10/9/2017), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/17. (Hellings, J)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Re Stipulation GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/1/17: 5-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/8/17. New Case Number: 1:17-cv-00388-SAB. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Khounpaseuth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Represented By: Zachary Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chansury Khounpaseuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arich Ath Syprasert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boualiene Sypraert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?