Purnell v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Georgette Purnell
Defendant: Trans Union LLC, Equifax, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00393
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Final Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/30/2020. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute the action, to appear, and comply with the Court's orders of March 17, 2017, and June 13, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Or der to Show Cause with respect to Defendant Equifax, Inc., only is discharged. These findings are referred to District Judge Dale A. Drozd, with objections due within 14 days of service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/22/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Terminating Defendant Trans Union LLC, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/1/17. Trans Union LLC terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purnell v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgette Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Kurtis Jeffery Anders
Represented By: Eileen T Booth
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?