Daniels Sharpsmart, Inc. v. Smith, et al.
Plaintiff: Daniels Sharpsmart, Inc.
Defendant: Karen Smith, Richard Pilorin, Alison Dabney and Ginger Hilton
Case Number: 1:2017cv00403
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER of DISMISSAL, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/7/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS WITHIN THIRTY DAYS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The stay in this action is CONTINUED; and The parties shall file dispositional documents within thirty days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/05/2018. (Hernandez, M)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING STAY IN THIS ACTION AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT within thirty days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2018. (Hernandez, M)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER CONTINUING STAY IN THIS ACTION AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/2018. (Hernandez, M)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONTINUING STAY IN THIS ACTION AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/3/2018. (Hernandez, M)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PARTIES JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY SO ORDERED THAT the stay in this matter is CONTINUED to July 30, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall submit a joint status report thirty days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/3/2018. (Hernandez, M)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING Stay in This Action Until July 16, 2018, While the Parties Continue Settlement Discussions and Requiring Parties to File a Joint Status Report on or Before July 2, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING November 9, 2017 Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 Parties' Joint Motion and Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/26/2017. CASE STAYED. The parties shall submit a joint report on the status of the stay within fourteen (14) days of the Ninth Circuit decision. (Jessen, A)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Directing Parties to File Motion to Stay Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/15/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE Amended Stipulation to Elect Referral of Action to Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP) Pursuant to Local Rule 271 and Continuing Scheduling Conference to November 9, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING PARTIES STIPULATION FOR REFERRAL TO VOLUNTARY DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROGRAM WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Joint Status Report, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/22/17. Case Management Deadline: 7/12/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER DENYING 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Defendants are Restrained and Enjoined from enforcing the MWMA against Daniel's Out-of-state waste disposal, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/13/17. Deadline: 06/23/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR STATE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER THEREON signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 23, 2017. (Munoz, I)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Terminate Morgan Hector as Attorney for Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/16/2017. Attorney Morgan Linscott Hector terminated.(Flores, E)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE Stipulation for Extension of Time for State Defendants to Respond to the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/05/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels Sharpsmart, Inc. v. Smith, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniels Sharpsmart, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Linscott Hector
Represented By: Jason Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Smith
Represented By: Renu George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pilorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Dabney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?