Morgan v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Morgan
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr., C. Baker, D. Meadows, J. Schutte, P. Guzman, J. Gomez, J. Garcia and J. McNutt
Case Number: 1:2017cv00425
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Closing the Action 90 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/27/2020. CASE CLOSED.(Orozco, A)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re Joint Stipulation for a 45-Day Extension to Comply With the Court's Order to Resolve the Settlement in This Matter and Dismiss the Matter in Its Entirety, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/13/20. (Marrujo, C)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 54 & 54 . Plaintiff's first motion in limine and Defendant's fourth motion in limine are held in abeyance. Plaintiff's second and third motions are OVERRULED. Defendant's first, and third motions in limine are SUSTAINED in part and OVERRULED in part. Defendant's second motion is SUSTAINED. Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/20/2018. (Timken, A)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 14, 2018. (ECF No. 38) (Munoz, I)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 36 Request to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/11/2018. Dispositive motions to be filed by 7/28/2018. (Hall, S)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/2/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 10/31/2017; Non-Expert 4/23/2018; Expert 5/18/2018. M id-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/30/2018; Hearing by 6/27/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/11/2018; Hearing by 8/22/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. The initial scheduling conference set for 10/10/2017 at 09:00 AM is VACATED. (Hall, S)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Denying 24 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/21/2017. (Flores, E)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Dismiss, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/29/2017. (21-DAY DEADLINE) (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Morgan
Represented By: Kevin Shawn Conlogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Schutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?