Quiroz v. City of Ceres
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Quiroz
Defendant: City of Ceres
Case Number: 1:2017cv00444
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER APPROVING 80 Settlement Agreement and DISMISSING Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/28/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff Randy Sullivan, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/18. (Gonzalez, R)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/13/2018: Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff: September 13, 2018; Expert Disclosures: September 27, 2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: Octo ber 11, 2018; Expert Discovery Cutoff: November 12, 2018; Non-Dispositive Motion Filing: November 23, 2018; Dispositive Motion Filing: November 30, 2018; Dispositive Motion Hearing: February 5, 2019; Pre-Trial Conference: April 22, 2019 at 3:30 p.m.Courtroom 5(DAD); and Bench Trial: June 18, 2019 at 1:00 p.m.(10 days est.) Courtroom 5(DAD). (Hellings, J)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER on Second Stipulation to Allow Multiple Plaintiffs to File Consent to be Included as Named Plaintiff signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/30/2018. (Flores, E)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 64 Stipulation to File Consent to be Included as Plaintiffs, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/03/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation Regarding Tolling Statute of Limitations, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/20/2018. (1. The parties' stipulation regarding tolling the statute of limitations for individuals listed on Attachment B (Doc. No. 62) is granted; 2. The parties are ordered to prepare and distribute the class notice to the potential plaintiffs in a manner consistent with the parties' stipulation.)(Gaumnitz, R)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Second 36 Motion for Conditional Certification and Facilitated Class Notice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/20/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Parties' 33 Stipulation Regarding Facilitated Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/7/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiffs 13 Motion for Conditional Certification and Facilitated Class Notice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/22/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Relating and Reassigning Cases, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/17. Related Cases: 1:17-cv-0355-DAD-MJS, 1:17-CV-0552-LJO-SAB. (Gonzalez, R)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/17: CASE TRANSFERRRED to Fresno Division. New Case Number 1:17-cv-00444 AWI SAB. Old Case Number 2:17-cv-00364 TLN CKD. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroz v. City of Ceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Quiroz
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Ace Thomas Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ceres
Represented By: Jesse Jeremy Maddox
Represented By: Michael David Youril
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?