Ibarra v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Alejandro Ibarra and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00452
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/10/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD WITHIN 14 DAYS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Within fourteen (14) days from the date of service of this order, Defendant shall file and serve a copy of the administrative record; and Failure to respond to this order could result in the imposition of sanctions, up to an including an entry of default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue Summons signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibarra v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Ibarra
Represented By: Stuart T. Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: C. Hay-Mie Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?