Honesto v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Peter Honesto
Defendant: Jerry Brown, Arnold Schwarzenegger, James Hartley and Tim Perez
Case Number: 1:2017cv00467
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That This Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Claims for Unconstitutional Conditions of Confinement Against Defendants Schwarzenegger, Hartley, and Adams, and That All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/17/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Submit Evidence in Support of First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/20/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-0076 JAM AC) to Fresno (1:17-cv-0467 EPG) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/31/17. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honesto v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Honesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?