Donnie Cummings et al v. Cenergy International Services, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Donnie Cummings, Christopher Jones and Charles Beaty |
Defendant: |
Cenergy International Services, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00484 |
Filed: |
April 5, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence J. O'Neill |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer L. Thurston |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
51
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Close the Action (Stipulation),signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/21/18. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 29, 2018 |
Filing
49
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND PARTIAL DISMISSAL; JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PENDING SETTLEMENT APPROVAL; AND ORDER THEREON signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 29, 2018. (Munoz, I)
|
February 15, 2018 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION and ORDER 31 to Stay Action Pending Alternative Dispute Resolution, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/15/2018. CASE STAYED. Joint status report due by 3/30/2018. (Hall, S)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
30
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/11/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 2/5/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 1/15/2018; Non-Expert 5/15/2018; Expert 7/24/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference se t for 3/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/31/2018; Hearing by 8/28/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/11/2018; Hearing by 10/2 3/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Bench Trial set for 2/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
|
October 4, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER on 25 Joint Stipulation to Continue Answer Deadline and Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/4/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 11/13/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM Decision and ORDER DENYING Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/20/17. (2-day deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
June 15, 2017 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss ; Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with 14-Day Leave to Amend; Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is held in abeyance pending amendment of the complaint, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/15/17. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?