Acosta v. Gomez et al
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Defendant: Adriana Gabriela Gomez, Huberto Gomez, Edmundo Sanchez and Rosalia Soledad Rodriguez Ruiz
Case Number: 1:2017cv00493
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which dispositional documents must be filed is extended to December 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE SECOND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM SERVICE DEADLINE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which Plaintiff must serve the First Amended Complaint on Defendant Enrique Sosa, is hereby extended from October 20, 2017 to December 4, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Service Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/31/2017. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER for further extension of time for defendants' responsive pleadings and to continue the Scheduling Conference from 8/31/2017 to 11/14/2017 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties are to file a joint scheduling report no later then seven days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/22/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants, Adriana Gabriela Gomez dba Zamora Carnitas Mexican Restaurant and Humberto Gomez dba Zamora Carnitas Mexican Restaurant, shall have to and including August 10, 2017 within which to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/25/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendants Edmundo Sanchez and Rosalia Soledad Rodriguez Ruiz Only signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE Scheduling Conference from 6/27/2017 to 8/31/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/22/2017. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Gomez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Acosta
Represented By: Zachary Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Gabriela Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huberto Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmundo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalia Soledad Rodriguez Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?