Darden v. Mechael et al
Plaintiff: Geraldine Darden
Defendant: Philipe Mechael, Ikwinder Singh, Robert Mitchell and H. Longia
Case Number: 1:2017cv00505
Filed: April 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING Action Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/23/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Defendants' 43 Request to Stay Proceedings Pending Appearance by a Representative on Plaintiff's Behalf, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/19. (Gonzalez, R)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Inmate Geraldine Darden is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/3/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Geraldine Darden, CDC# W-81216 for Settlement Conference on October 3, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/04/2018. (Flores, E)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/18. CASE STAYED. Settlement Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Denying Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant, and Directing Defendants to File an Answer to the Complaint within Twenty Days signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/21/2018. (Flores, E)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 21 Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant and Post Security Under Local Rule 151(b) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Docket and Notification, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 6 First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/23/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 11/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Vacating 8 Findings and Recommendations, and Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days to File a Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/14/2017. Thirty Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 6 First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/28/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darden v. Mechael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philipe Mechael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikwinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Longia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?