Millner v. Dileo et al
Plaintiff: James W. Millner
Defendant: Larry Dileo, Relevante, Ulit, Spaeth and Chief Medical Examiner
Case Number: 1:2017cv00507
Filed: April 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/15/2020. (Rivera, O)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections and Denying Motion for Reconsideration re 73 & 74 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/30/2020. (Jessen, A)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 64 Motion to STAY Action and to Modify the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2019. Case Stayed until June 15, 2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020. (Orozco, A)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's 64 Motion to Stay Action; Seven Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/2019. (Orozco, A)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 60 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order as to Dispositive Motion Deadline, and Denying Plaintiff's Request for an Impartial Medical Expert Witness re 61 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/9/19. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition and to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order, DENYING Plaintiff's Motion asking Court not to Grant Defendants' Motion to Compel Deposition and the Enlargement of Discovery, and DENYING without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, 48 , 49 , 51 and 52 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/4/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONSRegarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Exhaustion Grounds 44 , 53 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/6/2019: This matter is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Sur-Reply; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Exhaustion Grounds signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/24/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/26/2019. (Flores, E)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Supplement Motion to Compel filed on December 5, 2018,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2018. (Case Management Deadline: 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 42 Motion for Summary Judgment, without Prejudice, for Failure to Provide RAND Notice; Fourteen Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Dismiss Claims found cognizable against Chief Medical Examiner; Motion to dismiss (ECF No. 37) is construed as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, and the Clerk of Court is HEREBY ORDERED to terminate Defendant Chief Medical Examiner, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/5/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant Chief Medical Examiner to SHOW CAUSE within Thirty Days Why Default should not be Entered signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Requiring Defendants to File Answer to Complaint within Fourteen (14) days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/8/18. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS DISMISSING Certain Defendants, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/06/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 7 Motion for TRO, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/19/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Status of Marshal's Service on Dr. Dileo, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed only on Plaintiff's claim against Defendants Dileo, Ulit, Spaeth, and the Chief Medical Officer for deliberate indifference in violation of the Eighth Amendment based on his wris t injury; all othe claims and Defendants be dismissed for failure to state a cognizable claim for relief re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by James W. Millner.;referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/17. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Have Marshal's Office Serve Summons on Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plainitff's Motion for a Temporary Retraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 7 be DENIED ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/17. Objections to F&R due by 11/27/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Assistance by the United States Marshal for Service of Process on Defendant Dr. Dileo 11 ,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2017. (10-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING a Special Appearance on Behalf of Un-Served Defendants by Office of Attorney General and Directing Clerk of Court to Serve Order on Supervising Deputy Attorney General, Monica Anderson, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/12/17. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millner v. Dileo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Millner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Dileo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relevante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Medical Examiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?