Casillas v. Secretary of Corrections
Petitioner: Omar Casillas
Respondent: Secretary of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2017cv00511
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ADOPTING 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED With Prejudice ; ORDERED that the Court DECLINES to Issue a Certificate of Appealability, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/4/2020. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 30 ) be DENIED With Prejudice on the Merits signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/2/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING 45 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 40 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss; and ORDER Directing Respondent to File an Answer to the Petition Within Sixty (60) Days signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/11/2018. (Jessen, A)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Respondent's 40 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/15/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 34 Motion for Discovery as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER LIFTING STAY re 24 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/27/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 19 Third Motion for Stay and Abeyance signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/22/2017. First Status Report due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED PETITION as a Mixed Petition and GRANTING Petitioner Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/26/2017. Second Amended Petition due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of the 2 Motion for an Order of Stay and Abeyance signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/22/2017. (Flores, E)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION that the Court Deny Petitioner's 2 Motion for Stay and Abeyance, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/10/17. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:17-cv-0728 CMK HC) to Fresno (1:17-cv-0511 SKO HC) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/11/2017; this court has not ruled on petitioner's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casillas v. Secretary of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Omar Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?