Stevenson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kelli Lynn Stevenson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00532
Filed: April 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/14/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Motion for Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief (Doc. 16). Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before January 23, 2018. Defendant will not prejudiced by the brief delay, and all other deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order issued on April 18, 2017, are extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/18/2018. (Herman, H)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulation for extension of time, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/18/2017. (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Lynn Stevenson
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: C. Hay-Mie Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?