Zamora v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Veronica Zamora
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2017cv00544
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Close the Action Based Upon the Parties' Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/18/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 11/10/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 5/14/2018; Expert 7/27/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Ba kersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/10/2018; Hearing by 9/7/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/21/2018; Hearing by 11/6/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2017. (Hall, S)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order scheduling settlement conference and continuing case management conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/8/2017. (Joint Mandatory Scheduling Conference report Deadline: 7/11/2017; Initial Scheduling Conference se t for 7/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston) (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamora v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Zamora
Represented By: Brent D. Brehm
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Represented By: Glenn Robert Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Melissa M. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?