Walker v. DDS Juan Alzate
Plaintiff: Shanell Walker
Defendant: DDS Juan Alzate
Case Number: 1:2017cv00548
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Defendants Juan Alzate Dental Corporation's and Juan Alzate, D.D.S.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/24/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order GRANTING 36 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/4/2019. Attorney Edgar Ndjatou, PHV terminated. The March 26, 2019, hearing on the motion, set before Chief Judge Lawrence J. ONeill, is VACATED.(Rosales, O.)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures and setting Settlement Conference for 7/10/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/2/2018. (Rooney, M)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. DDS Juan Alzate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanell Walker
Represented By: Kevin M. Schwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDS Juan Alzate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?