Mendez v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Felipe Mendez, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America, Harjeet Ghotra, DDS, Adel Awad, MD, Caleb Querol, MD/CD, Angela Ramsey, Noelia Rivera, RN, Mendoza, C. Castaneda, A. Cisneros, Pavey, A. Lozano, Saenz, R. Quintero, B. Amos, D. Perez, C. Marlow, D. Gramm, S. Lake and A. Gill
Case Number: 1:2017cv00555
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADOPTING 72 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING 55 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/12/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 77 Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2020. Sixty-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING 75 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2020. (Marrujo, C)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 66 Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/03/2020. (Flores, E)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Spanish Interpreter ; ORDER GRANTING 62 Motion to Expand Page Limits; ORDER DENYING 64 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Submit Amended Reply within Fourteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/4/19.(Filing Deadline: 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Request to Expand Page Limits signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Directing Defendants to Submit Response to Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/12/19. Sixty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Withdrawing the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued for Felipe Mendez, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/11/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Telephonic Appearance for Felipe Mendez, Jr., Register #07213-030, on March 18, 2019 at 9:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/14/2019. (Flores, E)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Withdrawing the 41 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued for Felipe Mendez, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/14/19. (Gonzalez, R)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Telephonic Appearance for Felipe Mendez, Jr., Register #07213-030, on January 22, 2019 at 9:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/26/2018. (Flores, E)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/18. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Gonzalez, R)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Referring the Case to Post-Screening ADR Project and Staying the Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/24/2018. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion to Stay as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 17 Request to Withdraw Notice of Willingness to Proceed; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Second 18 Motion to Extend Time to File Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/26/2017. Sixty Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint re 7 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/17/17. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Mendez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harjeet Ghotra, DDS
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Awad, MD
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Querol, MD/CD
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Ramsey
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelia Rivera, RN
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendoza
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Castaneda
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Cisneros
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavey
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lozano
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saenz
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Quintero
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Amos
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Perez
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Marlow
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gramm
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lake
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gill
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?