Murray v. McKay, et al.
Plaintiff: Wesley Thomas Murray
Defendant: Marsha McKay, Tuolumne County Sheriff's Department, Tamara McCaig and Joan Lenerd
Case Number: 1:2017cv00564
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order, Failure to Prosecute, and Failure to State a Claim; Clerk to Re-Open Case signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/13/2017. referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 11/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for Failure to Obey a Court Order, Failure to Prosecute, and Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/06/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Action Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/28/2017. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:17-cv-0800 KJN PC) to Fresno (1:17-cv-0564 MJS PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/20/2017; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. McKay, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Thomas Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuolumne County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara McCaig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Lenerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?