Robles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Job Robles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00566
Filed: April 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER for the Award and Payment of Attorney Fees and Expenses, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/19. (Gonzalez, R)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER reversing agency's denial of benefits and ordering remand signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of Time: that Defendant shall have an extension of time, to and including April 18, 2018, in which to file a response Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Court's Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/20/2018. (Herman, H)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2018. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to February 16, 2018, in which to file an Opening Brief; Defendant shall have an extension of time to March 19, 2018, to file an opposition; and Plaintiff shall have until April 3, 2018, to file a reply, if any. (Valdez, E)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/25/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Job Robles
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?