Church v. Naftzger
Plaintiff: Jack Church
Defendant: J. Naftzger
Case Number: 1:2017cv00596
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Defendant's 42 Motion to Compel Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/04/2019. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 08/30/2019. (Flores, E)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/1/19. (Gonzalez, R)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM, to Appear by Video Conference, Jack Church, CDCR #AF-8463 on 02/22/19 at 1:30p.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/18. (Gonzalez, R)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/18. Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Gonzalez, R)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Vacating Discovery and Scheduling Order; Referring the Case to Post-Screening ADR Project; and Staying the Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2018. Case stayed. Thirty-Day Deadline to Return Form. (Flores, E)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING FINDNGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for Plaintiff to Proceed on Due Process Claim Against Naftzger in the Original Complaint, All Other Claims and Defendants are Dismissed, and the First Amended Complaint is Stricken From the Record 1 , 9 , 13 , 19 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/9/2018: This action is referred to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in accordance with this order. (Hellings, J)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS for Plaintiff to Proceed on Due Process Claim Against Naftzger in the Original Complaint 1 , All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed and First Amended Complaint 13 be Stricken from the Record; ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Assign a District Judge to this Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/29/18. This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The New Case No. is: 1:18-cv-00596-AWI-JLT. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within 21-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Appointment of Counsel 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/19/2017. (Hellings, J)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church v. Naftzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Naftzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?