Brothers, II v. Buenafe et al
Plaintiff: Aubrey Lee Brothers, II
Defendant: Chita Buenafe, N. Flores and T. Hood
Case Number: 1:2017cv00607
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court Deny 39 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies re 24 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/29/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Rivera, O)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 58 Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/2/2020. 7/20/2020 discovery closure date is EXTENDED to 8/31/2020. 8/31/2020 deadline to file motions for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 10/12/2020. (Rivera, O)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 54 and 56 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 05/22/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and ORDER DENYING 40 & 42 Pending Scheduling and Discovery Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/14/2020. Opposition to MSJ due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff Proceed on Cognizable Claims and that Non-Cognizable Claims be Dismissed Without Leave to Amend 24 , 28 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/30/2019: This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCREENING ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff Proceed On Cognizable Claims and that Non-Cognizable Claims be Dismissed without Leave to Amend re 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/8/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 25 , 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/7/2018: Motions are denied with prejudice. (Hellings, J)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge to this Case; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 15 Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/27/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/19/2018. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brothers, II v. Buenafe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Lee Brothers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chita Buenafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?