Messick v. Technipfmc US Holdings LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ron Messick
Defendant: Technipfmc US Holdings LLC, FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc., Technip USA, Inc and Technip USA Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00608
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/13/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/29/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 10/24/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 6/1/2018; Expert 8/17/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bak ersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/31/2018; Hearing by 9/28/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/12/2018; Hearing by 11/21/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Granting stipulation to allow Plaintiff to file an First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2017. ( Amended Complaint due by 6/12/2017) (Rosales, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messick v. Technipfmc US Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Messick
Represented By: Karl Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technipfmc US Holdings LLC
Represented By: Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Represented By: Daniel C Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Technologies Measurement Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Represented By: Daniel C Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technip USA, Inc
Represented By: Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Represented By: Daniel C Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technip USA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Represented By: Daniel C Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?