Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mercedez Sanchez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv00620
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close This Action in Light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/1/2018. Opening brief due by 4/2/2018. (Hall, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AMENDING THE SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDERING Plaintiff to Serve a Confidential Letter Brief Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/27/2017. (Hall, S)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2017. Amended complaint due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedez Sanchez
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Lahey, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?